EP0039925 - Tip lorry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1982 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.1983 [1983/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dondorff, Roman Industriestrasse 8 D-8501 Schwarzenbruck / DE | [1981/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Eduard, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | Lorenz, Eduard, et al Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/46] | Lorenz, Eduard Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103521.1 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | DE19800012568U | 09.05.1980 Original published format: DE 8012568 U | DE19803027752 | 22.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3027752 | [1981/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039925 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/04 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
B60P1/04 (EP);
B60P1/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugkipper | [1981/46] | English: | Tip lorry | [1981/46] | French: | Camion basculant | [1981/46] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/04] | 16.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE804779 ; | [X]CH351506 ; | US2867339 [ ]; | DE1028454 [ ] |