EP0040376 - Ultrasonic transducer array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diepers, Heinrich, Dr. Veit-Stoss-Strasse 44 D-8552 Höchstadt/Aisch / DE | 02 /
Vieth, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. Holzschuherring 22 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1981/47] | Application number, filing date | 81103531.0 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/47] | Priority number, date | DE19803019479 | 21.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3019479 | [1981/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040376 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/00, A61B10/00, G01S7/52, G01S15/10, H04R17/00 | [1981/47] | CPC: |
G10K11/345 (EP);
G01S7/52058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/47] | Title | German: | Ultraschallwandler-Array | [1981/47] | English: | Ultrasonic transducer array | [1981/47] | French: | Tableau de transducteurs à ultrasons | [1981/47] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 19.11.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4122725 [ ]; | US3513439 [ ]; | DE2718772 [ ]; | DE2651786 [ ]; | DE2902507 [ ]; | DE2713087 [ ]; | DE2543678 [ ]; | GB1480452 [ ] | [ ] - JOSEF u. HERBERT KRAUTKRAMER, Werkstoffprüfung mit Ultraschall, 1. Auflage, 1961, SPRINGER-VERLAG, Berlin/Göttingen/Heidelberg, Seiten 187,188 * Abbildung 2.54a ; Seite 1881. Absatz * |