EP0041166 - Didactical device for playing on musical instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1982 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.1983 [1983/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE LUCA, Ferdinando Via Ariosto, 26 I-20145 Milano / IT | [1981/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. Zini, Maranesi & C. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 81103771.2 | 16.05.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | IT19800021945U | 02.06.1980 Original published format: IT 2194580 U | [1981/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041166 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G09B15/02 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
G09B15/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/49] | Title | German: | Didaktische Vorrichtung zum Spielen auf Musikinstrumenten | [1981/49] | English: | Didactical device for playing on musical instruments | [1981/49] | French: | Dispositif didactique pour jouer d'un instrument de musique | [1981/49] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/07] | 06.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1295768 [ ]; | US3472117 [ ]; | US2542235 [ ] |