EP0065579 - Probe for measuring the intensity and direction of weak magnetic fields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/48] | Probe for measuring magnetic fields | ||
[1985/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1986 [1986/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metzner, Uwe Theodolindenstrasse 49 D-8000 München 90 / DE | 02 /
Thilo, Peer, Dr.-Ing. Buchhierlstrasse 19 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1982/48] | Application number, filing date | 81103921.3 | 21.05.1981 | [1982/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065579 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0065579 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/02 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/48] | Title | German: | Magnetfeldsonde zur Bestimmung eines schwachen Magnetfeldes nach Grösse und Richtung | [1985/33] | English: | Probe for measuring the intensity and direction of weak magnetic fields | [1985/33] | French: | Sonde pour mesurer l'intensité et la direction des champs magnétiques faibles | [1985/33] |
Former [1982/48] | Sonde zur Messung von Magnetfeldern | ||
Former [1982/48] | Probe for measuring magnetic fields | ||
Former [1982/48] | Sonde pour mesurer des champs magnétiques | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 29.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2379716 [ ] (HULL ALBERT W); | US2390051 [ ] (GUSTAV BARTH); | GB599428 [ ] (PURVES CORP); | US2468554 [ ] (HULL ALBERT W); | US2480265 [ ] (RUBENSTEIN JACOB H); | US2491736 [ ] (IRWIN EMMETT M); | US3040247 [ ] (ALLEN ROLAND L VAN); | AT244443B [ ] (WIENER SCHWACHSTROMWERKE GMBH); | DE2539455 [ ] (SPERRY RAND LTD); | DE2851415 [ ] (UNIV HOKKAIDO VERTRETEN DURCH) |