EP0044388 - Method for the determination of one or more parameters in samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenwiener, Hans-Georg, Dr. Kirschenstrasse 26 D-7858 Weil/Rhein / DE | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Kloter, Rudolf, et al Postfach 3255 Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1982/04] | Application number, filing date | 81103962.7 | 23.05.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | CH19800005564 | 21.07.1980 Original published format: CH 556480 | [1982/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044388 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/04] | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/59, G01N33/48 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/00 (EP);
C12Q1/52 (EP);
C12Q1/54 (EP);
G01N21/78 (EP);
G01N33/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von einem oder mehreren Parametern in Proben | [1982/04] | English: | Method for the determination of one or more parameters in samples | [1982/04] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination d'un ou plusieurs paramètres dans des échantillons | [1982/04] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1981 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 02.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1984/28] | 13.03.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |