EP0041213 - Glucose isomerase, process therefor and use for producing fructose from glucose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1984 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brownewell, Charles E. 1221 W. Lexington Ave. Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Senftl, Hannes, et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | Senftl, Hannes, Dr., et al c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patentabteilung D-5090 Leverkusen Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103998.1 | 25.05.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | US19800156496 | 04.06.1980 Original published format: US 156496 | [1981/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0041213 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0041213 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041213 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/92, C12P19/24, // C12R1/10 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
C12N9/92 (EP,US);
Y10S435/836 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1983/21] |
Former [1981/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Glucoseisomerase, Herstellungsverfahren und Verwendung zur Herstellung von Fructose aus Glucose | [1981/49] | English: | Glucose isomerase, process therefor and use for producing fructose from glucose | [1981/49] | French: | Glucose-isomérase, procédé d'obtention et application à la production de fructose à partir de glucose | [1981/49] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 25.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/49] | 30.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 13, March 31, 1980, page 319, Abstract 107000b Columbus, Ohio, US Z.G. AVAKYAN et al. "Distribution of Glucose Isomerase in Different Species of Spore-Forming Bacteria" & Biol. Zh. Arm. 1979, 32(9), 919-22 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, General Subject Index, 1980, page 211GS Columbus, Ohio, US "Bacillus Licheniformis" "Glucose Isomerase of 107000b * column 1, lines 39 and 59 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, No. 5, February 4, 1980, page 390, Abstract 37357x Columbus, Ohio, US I.M. GRACHEVA et al. "Glucose Isomerase of Microorganisms" & Itogi Nauki Tekh: Mikrobiol. 1978, 9, 41-88 * Abstract * |