EP0043002 - Minimum airflow control for individual units of a central air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.1986 [1986/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tulowiecki, David Alexander 7435 Farmstead Road Liverpool New York / US | 02 /
Lavassaur, Richard Roland 203 North Broad Street Oneida New York / US | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104416.3 | 09.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | US19800165456 | 02.07.1980 Original published format: US 165456 | [1982/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0043002 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0043002 | Date: | 24.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043002 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02, F24F11/04, F24F11/053 | [1982/08] | CPC: |
G05D23/185 (EP,US);
F24F11/76 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/01] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/01] | Title | German: | Steuerung eines Mindestluftstroms bei Einzelgeräten in einer zentralen Klimaanlage | [1982/01] | English: | Minimum airflow control for individual units of a central air conditioning system | [1982/01] | French: | Commande du volume d'air minimal des blocs individuels disposés dans un système de conditionnement d'air central | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/42] | 14.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 05.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4120453 [ ] (HERB CARL C, et al); | GB1287255 [ ] (CARRIER CORP [US]); | DE2225402 [ ] (TRANE CO); | US4090434 [ ] (KRISKO MICHAEL L, et al) |