EP0042144 - Method and arrangement for the simultaneous transmission of information by several common-wave transmitters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1985 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/51] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Logemann, Jörg, Ing.-grad. Alpenstrasse 21 D-7904 Erbach / DE | [1981/51] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Schulze, Harald Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1981/51] | Schickle, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 70 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104495.7 | 11.06.1981 | [1981/51] | Priority number, date | DE19803022425 | 14.06.1980 Original published format: DE 3022425 | [1981/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042144 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042144 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04H3/00, H04B7/01 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
H04H20/67 (EP);
H04B7/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [1981/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum zeitgleichen Aussenden von Nachrichten über mehrere Gleichwellensender | [1981/51] | English: | Method and arrangement for the simultaneous transmission of information by several common-wave transmitters | [1981/51] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la transmission simultanée d'informations par plusieurs émetteurs à ondes communes | [1981/51] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 10.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/29] | 22.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.05.1984 | AT | 11.06.1984 | CH | 30.06.1984 | LI | 30.06.1984 | [1986/45] |
Former [1985/23] | NL | 16.05.1984 | |
CH | 30.06.1984 | ||
LI | 30.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/15] | CH | 30.06.1984 | |
LI | 30.06.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2645901 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE2812774 [ ] (HEIL GEORG DIPL PHYS DR) | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Vehicular Technology, Band VT-28, Nr. 2, Mai 1979 New York, US G.D. GRAY: "The Simulcasting Technique: an Approach to Total-Area Radio Coverage", seiten 117-125 * seite 122, linke spalte, zeilen 1-46 * | [ ] - Wireless World, Band 86, Nr. 1534 Juni/Juli 1980 Haywards Heath, GB W.M. PANNEL: "Extending Mobile Radio Coverage", seiten 79-82 * seite 81, mittlere spalte, zeile 31 - seite 82, linke spalte , zeile 22; seite 82, rechte spalte, zeilen 44-48 und 66-74 * |