EP0043956 - Rolling mill for producing a hot-rolled strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/03] | Apparatus for centrally guiding the end of a thin hot-rolled strip and for the transport and/or adjustment of flat products in a hoop mill | ||
[1985/06] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.12.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLÖCKNER-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Klöcknerstrasse 29 D-4100 Duisburg 1 / DE | [1982/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiechmann, Karl-Ernst Malmöstrasse 5 D-2820 Bremen 77 / DE | [1982/03] | Representative(s) | Kiefer, Winfried Kasinostrasse 13 D-4100 Duisburg 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | Kiefer, Winfried, Dipl.-Phys. Kasinostrasse 13 D-4100 Duisburg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104924.6 | 25.06.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | DE19803026891 | 16.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3026891 | DE19813122196 | 04.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3122196 | [1982/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043956 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043956 | Date: | 06.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B21B39/02, B21C47/34 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
B21B39/02 (EP,US);
B21C47/34 (EP,US);
B21C47/3416 (EP,US);
B21C47/3425 (EP,US);
B21C47/3483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/03] | Title | German: | Walzstrasse zur Herstellung von Warmbreitband | [1985/06] | English: | Rolling mill for producing a hot-rolled strip | [1985/06] | French: | Train de laminage pour produire un feuillard à chaud | [1985/06] |
Former [1982/03] | Vorrichtung zum zentrischen Führen der Bandspitze von dünnen Warmbändern und zum Transportieren und/oder Justieren von Flachmaterial in Bandstrassen | ||
Former [1982/03] | Apparatus for centrally guiding the end of a thin hot-rolled strip and for the transport and/or adjustment of flat products in a hoop mill | ||
Former [1982/03] | Dispositif pour le quidage central du bout d'une bande mince laminée à chaud et pour le transport et/ou l'ajustage de matériaux plats dans un train à bandes | Examination procedure | 25.06.1981 | Examination requested [1982/03] | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1985
21.08.1985
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 02
05.11.1985
17.12.1985
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Grosse, Dietrich Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1985
21.08.1985
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | ||
02
05.11.1985
17.12.1985
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Grosse, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | |||
Former [1985/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.1985
21.08.1985
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 17.12.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.02.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.04.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.05.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.12.1987 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/06] | Appeal following opposition | 09.01.1987 | Appeal received No. T0030/87 | 17.11.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1029323 [ ] (DEMAG AG); | US3489325 [ ] (EPSTEIN HERMAN, et al); | FR2036442 [ ] (LOIRE ATEL FORGES); | DE2251592 [ ] (DEMAG AG); | DE2325327 [ ] (V NI I PK I METALL MASH) |