EP0043565 - Vibration/noise reduction device for electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1986 [1986/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Yasuro 2284-18, Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi / JP | 02 /
Kanoi, Minoru 1425-4-9-4, Oaza Suwama Tokaimura Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Seino, Kazuyuki 20-6, Moriyamacho-2-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Hagiwara, Syuya 11-1-1, Ayukawadai-Apartment House 3-B101, Ayukawacho-2-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/46] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/02] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105155.6 | 02.07.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | JP19800089979 | 03.07.1980 Original published format: JP 8997980 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043565 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043565 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
H01F27/33 (EP,US);
G10K11/17853 (EP,US);
G10K11/17873 (EP,US);
G10K2210/121 (EP,US);
G10K2210/125 (EP,US);
G10K2210/129 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3025 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3028 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3045 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3051 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vibrations- und/oder Lärmreduktion für elektrische Geräte | [1982/02] | English: | Vibration/noise reduction device for electrical apparatus | [1982/02] | French: | Dispositif pour la réduction des vibrations et ou du bruit pour des appareils électriques | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/38] | 08.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4066842 [ ] (ALLEN JONT BRANDON); | WO8100638 [ ] (SOUND ATTENUATORS LTD [GB], et al); | US4122303 [ ] (CHAPLIN GEORGE BRIAN BARRIE, et al) |