EP0044970 - Use of etherified 2-(4-hydroxybenzylidene)-gamma-butyrolactones as light protectants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1984 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/05] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoemel, Frank, Dr. Leberstrasse 17 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Werner, Dr. Ringstrasse 11 C D-6701 Neuhofen / DE | 03 /
Degner, Dieter, Dr. Kurpfalzstrasse 8 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | [1982/05] | Application number, filing date | 81105199.4 | 04.07.1981 | [1982/05] | Priority number, date | DE19803028502 | 26.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3028502 | [1982/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044970 | Date: | 03.02.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0044970 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044970 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42 | [1982/05] | CPC: |
C07D307/58 (EP);
A61K8/4973 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/05] | Title | German: | Verwendung von verätherten 2-(4-Hydroxybenzyliden)-gamma-butyrolactonen als Lichtschutzmittel | [1982/05] | English: | Use of etherified 2-(4-hydroxybenzylidene)-gamma-butyrolactones as light protectants | [1982/05] | French: | Utilisation de 2-(4-hydroxybenzylidène)-gamma-butyrolactones éthérifiés en tant qu'agents de protection contre la lumière | [1982/05] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/05] | 24.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DD112884 ; | [A]DE2160136 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) | [AD] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Band 24, Januar 1959 Easton (US) H. ZIMMER et al.: "Substituted gamma-Lactones.I.Preparation of alfa-Substituted gamma-Butyrol Actones by Condensation of gamma-Butyrolactone with Aldehydes. Hydrogenation of the Condensation Products" seiten 28-32 |