EP0049334 - Electronic divider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1982/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Günter Robert-Koch-Strasse 80 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Könekamp, Herbert Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | Könekamp, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105664.7 | 20.07.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | DE19803037416 | 03.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3037416 | [1982/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049334 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049334 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/161 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
G06G7/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Elektronischer Dividierer | [1982/15] | English: | Electronic divider | [1982/15] | French: | Diviseur électronique | [1982/15] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1984/34] | 10.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CONTROL ENGINEERING, Band 15, Nr. 5, Mai 1968, Seite 64, New YorkUS | [Y] - ELECTRONICS, Band 45, Nr. 10, 8 Mai 1972, Seiten 127-128, New YorkUS | [Y] - PHILIPS APPLICATION NOTE, Nr. 130, 1971, Seiten 1-5, EindhovenNL |