EP0044569 - Folding and unfolding implement or tool bar, particularly for agricultural machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/04] | Folding or unfolding implement or tool bar, particularly for agricultural machines | ||
[1984/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, David Carl 57th Ave 5550 N.W. Des Moines Iowa 50323 / US | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105817.1 | 23.07.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | US19800171591 | 23.07.1980 Original published format: US 171591 | [1982/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044569 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044569 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01B73/00 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
A01B73/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/04] | Title | German: | Zusammen- und auffaltbares Gerät oder Werkzeugträger, insb. für landwirtschaftliche Maschinen | [1984/24] | English: | Folding and unfolding implement or tool bar, particularly for agricultural machines | [1984/24] | French: | Appareil et porte-outils repliable ou dépliable, en particulier pour machines agricoles | [1984/24] |
Former [1982/04] | Zusammen- oder auffaltbares Gerät oder Werkzeugträger, insb. für landwirtschaftliche Maschinen | ||
Former [1982/04] | Folding or unfolding implement or tool bar, particularly for agricultural machines | ||
Former [1982/04] | Appareil ou porte-outils repliable ou dépliable, en particulier pour machines agricoles | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/12] | 16.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4030551 [ ] (BOETTO CHARLES, et al); | US3797580 [ ] (ROTH R); | US4151886 [ ] (BOETTO CHARLES [US], et al); | GB1531403 [ ] (INT HARVESTER CO) |