EP0045461 - An electronic system for the capture and register of data on a magnetic support for control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palencia, Alarcon Luis Santa Virgilia, 5 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Martin, juan lopez Vinateros, 70 Madrid / ES | [1982/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1982/06] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105862.7 | 24.07.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | ES19800493920 | 01.08.1980 Original published format: ES 493920 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045461 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045461 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
G07C3/10 (EP);
G07C5/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/06] | Title | German: | Elektronisches System zur Datenerfassung und -speicherung auf einem Magnetträger zur Steuerung | [1982/06] | English: | An electronic system for the capture and register of data on a magnetic support for control | [1982/06] | French: | Un système électronique pour la capture et l'enregistrement d'informations sur un support magnétique pour la commande | [1982/06] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/13] | 28.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.07.1983 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - AUTOTESTCON'78, November 28-30, 1978 H.A. GOLDSTAND: "Software techniques for a microprocessor-based data acquisition device"pages 63-70 | [X] - IEEE 1980 IECI PROCEEDINGS, "Applications of mini and microcomputers", March 17-20, 1980, PhiladelphiaPenn. (US) M.J. REDMOND et al.: "Design of the digital interface and computation portion of an automotive data acquisition and reduction module" | [X] - MESSEN + PR]FEN/AUTOMATIC, no.9, September 1979Woerishofen (DE) C. SPOHN: "Messdatenerfassung und Datenaufbereitung" pages 682-695 |