EP0046543 - Composition for simultaneously dyeing or tinting, washing and conditioning human hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.04.1994 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/09] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrader, Dieter Itterstrasse 7 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
Flemming, Peter, Dr. Rossbachstrasse 45 D-4200 Oberhausen/Sterkrade / DE | [1982/09] | Application number, filing date | 81106306.4 | 13.08.1981 | [1982/09] | Priority number, date | DE19803031535 | 21.08.1980 Original published format: DE 3031535 | [1982/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046543 | Date: | 03.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046543 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0046543 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/08, A61K7/13 | [1982/09] | CPC: |
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
A61K2800/5426 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/09] | Title | German: | Mittel zum gleichzeitigen Färben bzw. Tönen, Waschen und Konditionieren von menschlichen Haaren | [1982/09] | English: | Composition for simultaneously dyeing or tinting, washing and conditioning human hair | [1982/09] | French: | Composition pour la coloration ou la teinture, lavage et conditionnement simultanés des cheveux humains | [1982/09] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 11.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1986
27.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | 02
01.02.1986
21.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE HAARKOSMETIK UND PARFÜMERIEN GMBH Hertzstrasse 75 Postfach 30 20 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE Opponent's representative Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1986
27.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | ||
02
01.02.1986
21.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE HAARKOSMETIK UND PARFÜMERIEN GMBH Hertzstrasse 75 Postfach 30 20 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE Opponent's representative Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | |||
Former [1986/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1986
ADMISSIBLE Blendax GmbH Rheinallee 88 Postfach 15 80 D-55005 Mainz / DE | ||
02
01.02.1986
HAARKOSMETIK UND PARFÜMERIEN GMBH Hertzstrasse 75 Postfach 30 20 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | 06.03.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.06.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.07.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 23.08.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.12.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/24] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 27.07.1990 | Appeal received No. T0612/90 | 20.06.1991 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/25] | 28.08.1991 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/35] | 18.11.1991 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/47] | 09.12.1991 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/50] | 07.12.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 07.12.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 27.12.1990 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.08.1993 | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/03] | CH | 02.05.1985 | |
LI | 02.05.1985 | ||
SE | 14.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | SE | 14.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2190406 [ ] (GILLETTE CO [US]); | DE2423833 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | FR2229390 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | GB1394353 [ ] (GILLETTE CO); | DE2651749 [ ] (OREAL); | FR2331325 [ ] (OREAL [FR]) | Examination | US3962418 | DE2808841 | FR2402446 | - E. Sagarin: Cosmetics - Science and Technology (1957), S. 509-511. | - C.A. Nowak: Die kosmetischen Präparate, 2. Aufl. (1975), S. 624-626. |