EP0047864 - Holder for lengthy articles such as cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | For all designated states Kato Hatsujyo Co., Ltd. 51 Iwai-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Kato Hatsujyo Co., Ltd. 51 Iwai-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yaotani, Koichi 1781, Ninomiya Akikawa-shi Tokyo 197 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Minoru 17-1, Daimachi 1-chome Hachiohji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Seiichi 1376, Nakata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 245 / JP | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106322.1 | 13.08.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | JP19800115779 | 15.08.1980 Original published format: JP 11577980 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047864 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047864 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047864 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/12, H02G3/26 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
F16L3/13 (EP,US);
F16L3/24 (EP,US);
F16L3/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/12] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für längliche Teile, wie z.B. Kabel | [1982/12] | English: | Holder for lengthy articles such as cables | [1982/12] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour éléments allongés tels que des câbles | [1982/12] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4083523 (FISHER JOHN L); | [A]US2385209 (JOYCE EDWARD F); | [A]US3568964 (PERKINS JOHN W) |