EP0046969 - Steering unit for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1985 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orlandea, Nicolae Viorel 4150 E. 60th St. Davenport Iowa 52807 / US | 02 /
Wiley, Jack Cleveland 3732 - 40th St. Court Moline Illinois 61265 / US | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Werner, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | Gramm, Werner, Prof. Dipl.-Ing., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106579.6 | 25.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | US19800183536 | 02.09.1980 Original published format: US 183536 | [1982/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0046969 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0046969 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/30, B60K17/30 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
B60K17/303 (EP,US);
B62D7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/10] | B62D7/06, B60K17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Lenkung für ein Fahrzeug | [1982/10] | English: | Steering unit for vehicle | [1982/10] | French: | Direction pour véhicule | [1982/10] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/27] | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.1984 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR333183 (HENRI RENE MARIE CORMERY [FR]); | [X]US1856075 (MAGNUS HOLMQUIST ERNST RUDOLF); | [A]US2247137 (SCHULTZ RICHARD A); | [A]FR1143406 (VIBERTI OFF); | [A]US3351037 (ERNST MEILI); | [A]US3703216 (THIBODEAU JOHN L); | [AD]US4209072 (ORLANDEA NICOLAE [US], et al) |