EP0047005 - Benzoxazine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1985 [1985/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/10] | For all designated states DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayakawa, Isao, c/o Daiichi Seiyaku Laboratories No.16-13 Kitakasai 1-chome Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hiramitsu, Tokiyuki Daiichi Seiyaku Laboratories No. 16-13 Kitakasai 1-chome Edogawa ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Yoshiaki, c/o Daiichi Seiyaku Laboratories No.16-13 Kitakasai 1-chome Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1982/10] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter J. Prof.Dr.Dr. Kinzebach W. Dr. & Partner Bauerstrasse 22 Postfach 780 D-8000 München 43 / DE | ||
Former [1982/10] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Reitstötter J., Prof. Dr. Dr. Kinzebach W., Dr. P.O. Box 780 Bauerstrasse 22 D-8000 München 43 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81106747.9 | 28.08.1981 | [1982/10] | Priority number, date | JP19800121540 | 02.09.1980 Original published format: JP 12154080 | [1982/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0047005 | Date: | 10.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047005 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/06, A61K31/535, // (C07D498/06, 265:00, 221:00) | [1982/10] | CPC: |
C07C205/37 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D265/36 (EP,US);
C07D498/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/10] | Title | German: | Benzoxazin-Derivate | [1982/10] | English: | Benzoxazine derivatives | [1982/10] | French: | Dérivés de benzoxazine | [1982/10] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 13.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]US3883522 (GERSTER JOHN F); | [D]US3984548 (GERSTER JOHN F); | JPS5362829 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | DE2914258 [ ] (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD); | DE2939786 [ ] (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780925), vol. 89, no. 13, Database accession no. 101882G, page 260, column 2 | by applicant | US3883522 | US3984548 | JPS5476875 | JPS54138582 | - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1959), vol. 81, pages 94 - 101 |