EP0051722 - Battery charging system, especially for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1985 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gansert, Willi Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 34 D-7014 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
Kuhn, Edgar, Dipl.-Ing. Aspergle 10 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
Munz, Ulrich Lissenstrasse 36 D-7125 Kirchheim / DE | [1982/20] | Application number, filing date | 81106764.4 | 29.08.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | DE19803042194 | 08.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3042194 | [1982/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051722 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051722 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/14, H02J7/24 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
H02J7/16 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1982/20] | Title | German: | Batterieladesystem, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1982/20] | English: | Battery charging system, especially for motor vehicles | [1982/20] | French: | Système de charge de batterie, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1981 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 09.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2202832 [ ] (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | US3942096 [ ] (ITOH KATSUMI, et al); | US4019120 [ ] (FATTIC GERALD T); | DE2809712 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | EP0013496 [ ] (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) |