EP0047953 - Semipermeable composite membranes comprising modified polyvinyl alcohol, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1985 [1985/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIGENA AG Freie Strasse 103 CH-4051 Basel / CH | [1982/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linder, Charles, Dr. 20 Derech Yavneh Rehovot / IL | 02 /
Perry, Mordechai, Dr. 32 Sokolov Street Petach Tikvah / IL | 03 /
Kotraro, Reuven 11 Derech Yavneh Rehovot / IL | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Becher, Pauline, et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Postfach 160 CH-4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Becher, Pauline, Dr., et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Postfach 160 CH-4003 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 81107007.7 | 07.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | CH19800006925 | 16.09.1980 Original published format: CH 692580 | [1982/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047953 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047953 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047953 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, B01D31/00, B01D13/00 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B01D67/0093 (EP);
B01D67/00931 (US);
B01D71/38 (EP);
B01D71/381 (US);
B01D71/383 (US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F16/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Modifizierten Polyvinylalkohol enthaltende, semipermeable Kompositmembranen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1982/12] | English: | Semipermeable composite membranes comprising modified polyvinyl alcohol, process for their preparation and their use | [1982/12] | French: | Membranes composites semiperméables comprenant de l'alcool polyvinylique modifié, procédé pour leur fabrication et leur application | [1982/12] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 17.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2131220 (BUCKMAN LABOR INC); | [X]US3892665 (STEIGELMANN EDWARD F, et al); | [X]US3945927 (IMAI SATOSHI, et al); | [Y]DE2505255 (ALIGENA AG); | [A]DE2615954 (KURARAY CO); | [A]FR2371477 (UOP INC [US]); | [A]EP0010425 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [P]EP0025973 (ALIGENA AG [CH]); | [P]EP0026399 (ALIGENA AG [CH]) |