EP0051144 - Small-particles polymer dispersions containing polymerised nitrogen-containing monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichel, Fritz, Dr. Holunderweg 3 D-6945 Hirschberg / DE | 02 /
Richter, Konrad, Dr. Amsterdamer Strasse 14 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Hoehr, Lothar, Dr. Giselherstrasse 14 D-6520 Worms / DE | [1982/19] | Application number, filing date | 81107476.4 | 21.09.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | DE19803039976 | 23.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039976 | [1982/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051144 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051144 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08F246/00, C08F220/34, D21H3/38, C08F2/06 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
D21H17/455 (EP);
C08F2/06 (EP);
C08F246/00 (EP);
D21H17/42 (EP);
D21H21/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/19] | Title | German: | Feinteilige, stickstoffhaltige Monomere einpolymerisiert enthaltende Polymerdispersion | [1982/19] | English: | Small-particles polymer dispersions containing polymerised nitrogen-containing monomers | [1982/19] | French: | Dispersions de polymères à fines particules comprenant des monomères contenant de l'azote polymérisé | [1982/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 21.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3706722 [ ] (NELSON ALFRED R, et al); | DE2452585 [ ] (BASF AG); | FR2290454 [ ] (BASF AG [DE], et al) |