EP0048482 - Rotary percussive drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Frank Flintoft No. 1 Boleyn Close Staines Middlesex / GB | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Kador, Utz Ulrich Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kador, Ulrich Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/32] | Kador, Ulrich, Dr. Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/28] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/21] | Kador . Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Corneliusstrasse 15 D-8000 München 5 / DE | ||
Former [1982/13] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107493.9 | 21.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | GB19800030556 | 22.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8030556 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048482 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048482 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B25D16/00, B23B45/16 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
B25D16/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/13] | Title | German: | Drehschlag-Bohrwerkzeug | [1982/13] | English: | Rotary percussive drill | [1982/13] | French: | Perceuse rotative à percussion | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/45] | 19.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.1984 | CH | 17.10.1984 | IT | 17.10.1984 | LI | 17.10.1984 | SE | 17.10.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.10.1984 | |
CH | 17.10.1984 | ||
IT | 17.10.1984 | ||
LI | 17.10.1984 | ||
SE | 17.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/16] | AT | 17.10.1984 | |
CH | 17.10.1984 | ||
LI | 17.10.1984 | ||
SE | 17.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 17.10.1984 | |
CH | 17.10.1984 | ||
LI | 17.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/12] | CH | 17.10.1984 | |
LI | 17.10.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | DE6906110U [ ] (METABOWERKE KG [DE]); | US3998278 [ ] (STILTZ ERWIN, et al); | DE2806611 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE2605998 [ ]; | EP0029968 [ ] (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) |