EP0051731 - Water-insoluble azo dyestuff, its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/20] | Water-insoluble azo dyestuffs, their preparation and use | ||
[1984/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1982/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tappe, Horst, Dr. Ringstrasse 9 D-6057 Dietzenbach / DE | 02 /
Roth, Kurt Breckenheimerstrasse 35 D-6238 Hofheim / DE | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr. Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107516.7 | 22.09.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | DE19803036576 | 27.09.1980 Original published format: DE 3036576 | [1982/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051731 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051731 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/09, // D06P5/17 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
C09B29/0085 (EP,US);
C09B29/0816 (EP,US);
Y10S8/922 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/20] | Title | German: | Wasserunlöslicher Azofarbstoff, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung | [1982/20] | English: | Water-insoluble azo dyestuff, its preparation and use | [1984/52] | French: | Colorant azoique insoluble dans l'eau, sa préparation et son utilisation | [1984/52] |
Former [1982/20] | Water-insoluble azo dyestuffs, their preparation and use | ||
Former [1982/20] | Colorants azoiques insolubles dans l'eau, leur préparation et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 30.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 12.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/24] | GB | 22.09.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2856283 [ ] (CASSELLA AG [DE]); | JPS55133457 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | US4271071 [ ] (CLARK GARY T) |