EP0055330 - A process for generating energy in the form of heat and hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/27] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuomo, Jerome John Box 353 Lincolndale New York 10540 / US | 02 /
Woodall, Jerry McPherson 336 Cherry Street Bedford Hills New York 10507 / US | [1982/27] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1987/18] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/20] | Mitchell, Allan Edmund IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1986/18] | Appleton, John Edward IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1983/36] | Lancaster, James Donald IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester, Hants, S021 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1982/27] | Chaudhry, Mohammad Saeed IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81107580.3 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/27] | Priority number, date | US19800221650 | 31.12.1980 Original published format: US 221650 | [1982/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0055330 | Date: | 07.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0055330 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/08 | [1982/27] | CPC: |
C01B3/08 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Energiegewinnung in Form von Wärme und Wasserstoff | [1982/27] | English: | A process for generating energy in the form of heat and hydrogen | [1982/27] | French: | Procédé pour engendrer d'énergie en forme de chaleur et d'hydrogène | [1982/27] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1981 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 21.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 12.03.1987 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.02.1984 | Appeal received No. T0105/84 | 11.04.1984 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.11.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/46] | 18.12.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/51] | 12.03.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE45824 [ ]; | US3348919 [ ] (KARL SHUMWAY DURLAND); | SU125549 [ ]; | US2623812 [ ] (DORIS EBORALL ESTHER MYRIAM, et al); | US3540854 [ ] (BROOKE ARTHUR W JR, et al) |