EP0047534 - Process for producing insulating laminates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oizumi, Masayuki 2-34, Yoshida-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe city Hyogoa / JP | 02 /
Goto, Masana 4-23, Suehiro 3-chome Miki city Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Ishiki, Minoru 2-29, Yoshida-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe city Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Uozumi, Shoji 2-25, Yoshida-cho 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe city Hyogo / JP | [1982/11] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/11] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107623.1 | 01.02.1980 | [1982/11] | Priority number, date | JP19790011780 | 02.02.1979 Original published format: JP 1178079 | [1982/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0047534 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0047534 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0047534 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/12 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B15/12 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
H01B3/48 (EP,US);
H05K1/036 (EP,US);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
B32B2260/028 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/062 (US);
B32B2305/08 (US);
B32B2307/206 (US);
B32B2457/00 (US);
H05K2201/0145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0166 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0284 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0293 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31515 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31518 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3162 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31627 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31688 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31699 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31703 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3179 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31906 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung isolierender Schichtstoffe | [1982/11] | English: | Process for producing insulating laminates | [1982/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de laminés isolants | [1982/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 05.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80100515.8 / EP0014444 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB743900 (MAC ECHERN & COMPANY LTD, et al); | [A]GB950704 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH); | [Y]US4012267 (KLEIN THEODORE HAROLD); | [X]EP0014444 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) |