EP0049455 - Moulded body for holding an anchor and for producing a cavity in a finished concrete product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fricker, Siegfried Wacholderweg 27 D-71296 Heimsheim / DE | [1982/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Frank, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | Frank, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107706.4 | 29.09.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | DE19803037596 | 04.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3037596 | [1982/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049455 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049455 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049455 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/28, B28B23/00, E04G15/04 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
B28B7/28 (EP,US);
B28B23/005 (EP,US);
E04G15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Formkörper zur Ankerhalterung und zur Erzeugung einer Aussparung in einem Betonfertigteil | [1982/15] | English: | Moulded body for holding an anchor and for producing a cavity in a finished concrete product | [1982/15] | French: | Corps de moulage pour le maintien d'ancre et pour la production d'une cavité dans une pièce fabriquée en béton | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/48] | 29.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1970860 [ ] (LOWELL JOHN W); | US2366656 [ ] (SAFFERT GEORGE J); | GB866164 [ ] (ALEXANDER FELDMANN); | FR2167274 [ ] (ARTEON MARCEL [FR]) |