EP0051737 - Tufting device and tufting process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS TROISDORF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 11 65 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1982/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunert, Franz Bergstrasse 1 D-6419 Haunetal 1 / DE | 02 /
Markus, Horst Kathuser Strasse D-6430 Bad Hersfeld 1 / DE | [1982/20] | Application number, filing date | 81107807.0 | 01.10.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | DE19803042000 | 07.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3042000 | [1982/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051737 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D05C15/12 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
D05C15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von getufteten Geweben | [1982/20] | English: | Tufting device and tufting process | [1982/20] | French: | Machine et procédé pour le tufting | [1982/20] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3443534 ; | [X]US3850120 |