EP0057746 - Heat flux limiting sleeves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1985 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harris, William Gilbert 4001 S. Westshore Apt. 603 Tampa Florida / US | [1982/33] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus-Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/33] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107817.9 | 01.10.1981 | [1982/33] | Priority number, date | US19810230554 | 02.02.1981 Original published format: US 230554 | [1982/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057746 | Date: | 18.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057746 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/06, F28F13/14 | [1982/33] | CPC: |
F28F13/14 (EP,US);
F22B1/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/33] | Title | German: | Hülsen zum Beschränken des Wärmestromes | [1982/33] | English: | Heat flux limiting sleeves | [1982/33] | French: | Manchons limitant le flux de chaleur | [1982/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 08.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2097056 (CHAUSSON USINES SA); | [A]FR1560761 ; | [A]GB1431785 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]LU62323 (BABCOCK ATLANTIQUE SA [FR]) |