EP0058227 - Stenter for textile webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.03.1990 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1990 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstrasse 8-10 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | For all designated states Brückner Trockentechnik GmbH & Co. KG Benzstrasse 8-10 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietz, Roland Blumenstrasse 31 D-7255 Rutesheim / DE | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur. Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107818.7 | 01.10.1981 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | DE19810004251U | 17.02.1981 Original published format: DE 8104251 U | [1982/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058227 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058227 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0058227 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/34, D06H3/12 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
D06H3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1982/34] | Title | German: | Spannmaschine für textile Warenbahnen | [1982/34] | English: | Stenter for textile webs | [1982/34] | French: | Rameuse pour bandes textiles | [1982/34] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 11.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1985
18.11.1985
ADMISSIBLE A. Monforts GmbH & Co D-4050 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.1985
18.11.1985
ADMISSIBLE A. Monforts GmbH & Co D-4050 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | 19.11.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 15.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.04.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.08.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.09.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.02.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1906801 [ ] (MAHLO GMBH); | DE2417409 [ ]; | DE2136026 [ ] |