EP0050780 - Isocyanato-oxazolinones, method for the preparation of oxazolidin-2-one rings containing plastics precursors, and their use in the preparation of high-molecular plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1984 [1984/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rasshofer, Werner, Dr. Wolfskaul 10 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Grögler, Gerhard, Dr. von-Diergardt-Strasse 46 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Meyborg, Holger, Dr. Bergisch-Gladbacher-Strasse 1 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1982/18] | Application number, filing date | 81108195.9 | 12.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | DE19803039929 | 23.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039929 | [1982/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050780 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050780 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/58, C07D263/60, C07D263/62, C08G59/40, C08G18/78, C08G73/00 | [1982/18] | CPC: |
C07D263/58 (EP);
C07D263/60 (EP);
C07D263/62 (EP);
C08G18/714 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/18] | Title | German: | Isocyanato-oxazolinone, ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Oxazolin-2-on-Ringe aufweisenden Kunststoffvorläufern und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von hochmolekularen Kunststoffen | [1982/18] | English: | Isocyanato-oxazolinones, method for the preparation of oxazolidin-2-one rings containing plastics precursors, and their use in the preparation of high-molecular plastics | [1982/18] | French: | Isocyanatooxazolinones, procédé pour la préparation de précurseurs de matières plastiques présentant le système cyclique d'oxazolinone-2 et leur utilisation pour la préparation de matières plastiques de poids moléculaire élevé | [1982/18] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/18] | 12.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2429562 [ ] (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED); | DE105230 [ ]; | DE1595417 [ ] | Examination | DD105230 | - C.A. 88(1978) Nr. 38384h |