EP0050791 - Electrically operated regulating unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göpfert, Max Schweidnitzer Strasse 43B D-8000 München 50 / DE | 02 /
Kleinschmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Klagenfurter Strasse 12 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1982/18] | Application number, filing date | 81108294.0 | 13.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | DE19803040563 | 28.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3040563 | [1982/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0050791 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0050791 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050791 | Date: | 11.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/08 | [1982/18] | CPC: |
H10N30/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/18] | Title | German: | Elektrisch zu betätigendes Stellglied | [1982/18] | English: | Electrically operated regulating unit | [1982/18] | French: | Organe de réglage à commande électrique | [1982/18] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/18] | 12.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2329502 |