EP0062695 - Automatic belt loop tacker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1984 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.1984 [1984/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breck, Jr., Louis William Eight Joe Turner Court El Paso Texas 79915 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | For all designated states Breck, Jr., Louis William Eight Joe Turner Court El Paso Texas 79915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108347.6 | 15.10.1981 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | US19810254455 | 15.04.1981 Original published format: US 254455 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0062695 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D05B23/00 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
D05B35/068 (EP,US);
D05D2207/02 (EP,US);
D05D2207/04 (EP,US);
D05D2209/14 (EP,US);
D05D2303/20 (EP,US);
D05D2305/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bildung von Gürtelschlaufen an Kleidungsstücken | [1982/42] | English: | Automatic belt loop tacker | [1982/42] | French: | Poseur automatique de passants pour couture | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 24.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1573763 (MIYACHI SEWING MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]DE2740780 (MIYACHI SEWING MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]US4048931 (HODGINS HOWARD A); | [A]FR2416858 (VALTON SA [FR]); | [A]US3699907 (ANDERSON SVEN, et al); | [A]DE1035456 (SCHMIDT OTTO); | [A]FR2369806 (PARISIENS CONFECTION ATEL [FR]); | [A]US3799086 (BLOCK C) |