EP0050344 - Combination tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1986 [1986/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hahn & Kolb Königstrasse 14 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1982/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Betz, Wolfgang Fuchshofweg 9 D-7060 Schorndorf / DE | 02 /
Hoffmann, Erich Am Lauterwald D-7531 Ölbronn-Dürnn / DE | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108461.5 | 17.10.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | DE19803039456 | 18.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039456 | [1982/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0050344 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0050344 | Date: | 07.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050344 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/26 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
B23B51/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/17] | Title | German: | Kombinationswerkzeug | [1982/17] | English: | Combination tool | [1982/17] | French: | Outil combiné | [1982/17] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 07.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1552556 (SCHMID MASCHB KG); | [A]DE2405506 (DSO ZMM BG); | [A]DE2328176 ; | [A]CH583084 (KOCH BENNO); | [Y]DE7827203U ; | [Y]EP0015248 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [XP]DE8027894U |