EP0050352 - X-ray television arrangement for monitor photography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haendle, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Leipzigerstrasse 16 g D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Horbaschek, Heinz Dreibergstrasse 10 a D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1982/17] | Application number, filing date | 81108509.1 | 19.10.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | DE19803039708 | 21.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039708 | [1982/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050352 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050352 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
H04N5/32 (EP,US);
H04N1/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1982/17] | Title | German: | Röntgenfernseheinrichtung für Monitorfotografie | [1982/17] | English: | X-ray television arrangement for monitor photography | [1982/17] | French: | Arrangement de télévision à rayons X pour photographier le moniteur | [1982/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/17] | 20.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2122155 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | FR2268416 [ ] (AEROSPATIALE [FR]); | FR2448275 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |