EP0052752 - Stay for windows or doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO Heinz Schürmann GmbH & Co. Karolinenstrasse 1-15 D-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | [1982/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Rüdiger Thusneldastrasse 56 D-4937 Lage-Lippe / DE | 02 /
Ziemer, Klaus-Dieter Im Twistel 28 D-4800 Bielefeld 15 / DE | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [1982/30] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [1982/22] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A. Stracke Dipl.-Ing. K.O. Loesenbeck Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108527.3 | 20.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | DE19803044308 | 25.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3044308 | [1982/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052752 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052752 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052752 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/52 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
E05D15/5205 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/22] | Title | German: | Ausstellvorrichtung für Fenster oder Türen | [1982/22] | English: | Stay for windows or doors | [1982/22] | French: | Dispositif de déflecteur pour fenêtres ou portes | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/31] | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.09.1985
21.10.1985
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE | 02
11.09.1985
23.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1985/47] |
Former [1985/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.09.1985
21.10.1985
ADMISSIBLE SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Postfach 10 05 51 D-57005 Siegen / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 22.10.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.12.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.04.1987 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | Appeal following opposition | 07.03.1987 | Appeal received No. T0080/87 | 11.04.1987 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.12.1984 | SE | 12.12.1984 | NL | 31.12.1984 | [2004/10] |
Former [2002/29] | FR | 12.12.1984 | |
SE | 12.12.1984 | ||
Former [2002/24] | FR | 12.12.1984 | |
Former [1989/23] | CH | 12.12.1984 | |
LI | 12.12.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1961348 ; | [A]CH210562 (WALZ WILHELM [CH]); | [A]DE1225987 (FRANK WILHELM); | [A]CH491273 (FRANK GMBH WILH [DE]); | [A]DE2232853 (SCHUERMANN & CO HEINZ) | Examination | DE2839803 |