EP0052757 - Method of decoding phrases and obtaining a readout of events in a text processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deacon, John Joseph 6706 Rustling Oaks Trail Austin Texas 78759 / US | 02 /
Wood, Donald Edwin 8115 Brettonwoods Austin Texas 78753 / US | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | Bonneau, Gérard Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 81108567.9 | 20.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | US19800208895 | 20.11.1980 Original published format: US 208895 | [1982/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0052757 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0052757 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052757 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
G06F40/274 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Satzdekodierung und Gewinnung einer Ausgabe von Ereignissen in einer Textverarbeitungsanlage | [1982/22] | English: | Method of decoding phrases and obtaining a readout of events in a text processing system | [1982/22] | French: | Procédé pour le décodage de phrases et pour obtenir la lecture d'événements dans un système de traitement de texte | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/22] | 27.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 01.02.1985 | Appeal received No. T0115/85 | 29.03.1985 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.09.1987 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1987/38] | 05.09.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0014312 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4214125 (MOZER FORREST S [US], et al); | [A]FR2319937 |