EP0059245 - Part-winding starting circuit for three-phase motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghosh, Shyamal-Krishna, Dipl.-Ing. Hohenrother-Strasse 22 D-8740 Bad Neustadt/Saale / DE | [1982/36] | Application number, filing date | 81108735.2 | 22.10.1981 | [1982/36] | Priority number, date | DE19813107654 | 27.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3107654 | [1982/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0059245 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0059245 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/26, H02K3/28 | [1982/36] | CPC: |
H02P1/26 (EP,US);
H02K3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/36] | Title | German: | Teilwicklungsschaltung zum Anfahren von Drehstrommotoren | [1982/36] | English: | Part-winding starting circuit for three-phase motors | [1982/36] | French: | Circuit pour le démarrage sur fraction d'enroulement de moteurs à courant triphase | [1982/36] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 01.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3187245 [ ] (SISK HOLLIS D, et al); | AT144757B [ ] (AEG UNION ELEK WIEN); | DE1638350 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE693695 [ ] (AEG); | DE280052 [ ] |