EP0053696 - Process for the preparation of cycloaliphatic and/or aromatic amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goetz, Norbert, Dr. Schoefferstrasse 25 D-6520 Worms / DE | 02 /
Jacobs, Peter, Dr. Kalmitstrasse 2 D-6718 Gruenstadt / DE | 03 /
Hupfer, Leopold, Dr. Waltershoehe 3 D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE | 04 /
Toussaint, Herbert, Dr. Knietschstrasse 11 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Reiss, Wolfgang, Dr. Bannwasserstrasse 70 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1982/24] | Application number, filing date | 81108813.7 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | DE19803045719 | 04.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3045719 | [1982/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053696 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053696 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C85/06, C07C85/24 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
C07C209/18 (EP,US);
C07C209/72 (EP,US);
B01J21/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von cycloaliphatischen und/oder aromatischen Aminen | [1982/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of cycloaliphatic and/or aromatic amines | [1982/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'amines cycloaliphatiques et/ou aromatiques | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 24.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH445476 (ALLIED CHEM [US]); | [A]US3351661 (MUNSTER FREDERIK H VAN); | [A]FR1506010 (DU PONT); | [AD]US3361818 (BARKER ROBERT S); | [DA]US3931298 (WOLLENSAK JOHN C); | [AD]DE2045882 ; | [E]EP0022751 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |