EP0077843 - Handle bag making apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crawford, Donald Christy 320 Roselawn Boulevard Green Bay Wisconsin / US | 02 /
Aterianus, John Samuel 1064 Echo Lane Green Bay Wisconsin / US | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bardehle, Heinz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/05] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-8000 München 86 / DE | ||
Former [1983/18] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81108928.3 | 26.10.1981 | [1983/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077843 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077843 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B31B37/86, B31B37/92 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
B65H35/04 (EP);
B31B70/00 (EP);
B31B2155/00 (EP);
B31B2155/003 (EP);
B31B2160/10 (EP);
B31B70/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Tragtaschen | [1983/18] | English: | Handle bag making apparatus | [1983/18] | French: | Appareil pour la fabrication de sacs à poigneés | [1983/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 14.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2023063 ; | [Y]US1456249 ; | [Y]US4137804 ; | [Y]US4092889 ; | [Y]GB1106705 ; | [A]DE1937480 ; | [A]US2615376 ; | [A]GB1279444 ; | [A]US3949631 ; | [A]DE2259444 ; | [A]US4093204 ; | [A]DE2225849 |