EP0052281 - Device for coating a conveyor belt with a liquid agent, especially for coating a baking belt with a release agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rud. Bieri Maschinen und Apparatebau AG Bietenholzstrasse 3 CH-8307 Effretikon / CH | [1982/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bieri, Rudolf Zielstrasse 21 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1982/21] | Representative(s) | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Wann Patentanwaltsbüro Zwängiweg 7 CH-8038 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 81109193.3 | 29.10.1981 | [1982/21] | Priority number, date | CH19800008461 | 14.11.1980 Original published format: CH 846180 | [1982/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052281 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052281 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/16, B05C5/00 | [1982/21] | CPC: |
B05C5/00 (EP,US);
A21B3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Beschichten eines Förderbandes mit einem flüssigen Medium, insbesondere zum Beschichten eines Backbandes mit einem Trennmittel | [1982/21] | English: | Device for coating a conveyor belt with a liquid agent, especially for coating a baking belt with a release agent | [1982/21] | French: | Appareil pour enduire une bande transporteuse avec un agent liquide, notamment pour enduire une bande de cuisson avec un agent séparateur | [1982/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 24.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.10.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/26] | GB | 29.10.1985 | |
SE | 30.10.1985 | ||
Former [1989/08] | SE | 30.10.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1000921 [ ]; | GB784683 [ ] (T & T VICARS LTD, et al); | US3077857 [ ] (IRVING WIDNER); | GB823102 [ ] (COOP WHOLESALE); | DE2834180 [ ] (HPW HERZBERGER PLATTENWERKE) |