EP0053287 - Building, in particular storing silo, for bulk-goods, workshop or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ries, Werner Liebersbacher Strasse 4 D-6943 Birkenau / DE | For all designated states Cornelius, Wilhelm, Dr. Ing. Olbrichweg 23 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1982/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/23] | Representative(s) | Kempe, Wolfgang Postfach 1273 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/23] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. Postfach 1273 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109216.2 | 29.10.1981 | [1982/23] | Priority number, date | DE19803045320 | 02.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3045320 | [1982/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053287 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053287 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E04H7/30, E04C3/32 | [1982/23] | CPC: |
E04C3/32 (EP);
E04C2/322 (EP);
E04H7/30 (EP);
Y02A40/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/23] | Title | German: | Gebäude, insbesondere Lagersilo für Schüttgut, Werkhalle oder dergleichen | [1982/23] | English: | Building, in particular storing silo, for bulk-goods, workshop or the like | [1982/23] | French: | Bâtiment, en particulier silo-entrepôt pour marchandises en vrac, atelier ou analogue | [1982/23] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 12.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.05.1984 | NL | 30.05.1984 | SE | 30.05.1984 | AT | 29.10.1984 | BE | 31.10.1984 | CH | 31.10.1984 | LI | 31.10.1984 | LU | 31.10.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | IT | 30.05.1984 | |
NL | 30.05.1984 | ||
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
AT | 29.10.1984 | ||
BE | 31.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
LU | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.05.1984 | |
NL | 30.05.1984 | ||
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
AT | 29.10.1984 | ||
BE | 31.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1991/51] | NL | 30.05.1984 | |
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
AT | 29.10.1984 | ||
BE | 31.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/17] | NL | 30.05.1984 | |
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
AT | 29.10.1984 | ||
CH | 31.10.1984 | ||
LI | 31.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/47] | NL | 30.05.1984 | |
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
AT | 29.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | NL | 30.05.1984 | |
SE | 30.05.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | NL | 30.05.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | BE694416 [ ]; | DE1434855 [ ] (SIEGENER AG EISENKONSTRUKTION); | FR2322991 [ ] (DAGUET ETS [FR]); | CH603959 [ ] (DESSAIR JEAN PAUL) |