EP0054742 - Polyvinyl chloride compositions containing trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate and zinc phosphite for smoke suppression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/26] | Polyvinyl chloride polymer compositions containing trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate and zinc phosphite for smoke suppression | ||
[1985/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMAX INC. Amax Center Greenwich, CT 06836 / US | [1982/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsigdinos, George A. 1810 Traver Road Ann Arbor Michigan / US | 02 /
Weber, Thomas R. 2811 Cranbrook Ann Arbor Michigan / US | 03 /
Moore, Fred W. 11651 Aspen Drive Plymouth Michigan / US | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109532.2 | 05.11.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800216894 | 16.12.1980 Original published format: US 216894 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0054742 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0054742 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054742 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, C08K3/24, C08K3/32 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/01, C08K3/22, C08K3/24, C08K3/32 (EP);
C08K3/24, C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/32, C08L27/06 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/26] | C08L27/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/26] | Title | German: | Polyvinylchloridzusammensetzungen, die Trizinkdimolybdatmonohydrat und Zinkphosphit als Rauchentzieher enthalten | [1982/26] | English: | Polyvinyl chloride compositions containing trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate and zinc phosphite for smoke suppression | [1985/32] | French: | Compositions de chlorure de polyvinyle contenant du trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate et un phosphate de zinc pour la suppression de la fumée | [1985/32] |
Former [1982/26] | Polyvinyl chloride polymer compositions containing trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate and zinc phosphite for smoke suppression | ||
Former [1982/26] | Compositions polymères de chlorure de polyvinyle contenant du trizinc dimolybdate monohydrate et un phosphate de zinc pour la suppression de la fumée | Examination procedure | 30.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 01.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/26] | GB | 05.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3900441 (KING THOMAS Y) |