EP0053741 - Purification of cellulose and starch ethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.11.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/24] | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 15 15 D-29655 Walsrode / DE | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernert, Claus-Rüdiger, Dr. Radewiesen 23 D-3030 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
Hartwig, Volker Idinger Heide Nr. 5 D-3032 Fallingbostel / DE | 03 /
Kords, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Ahornring 29 D-3030 Walsrode / DE | 04 /
Redeker, Detmar, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 53 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1982/24] | Representative(s) | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Zobel, Manfred, et al LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP IPR 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1988/05] | Zobel, Manfred, Dr., et al BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1986/25] | Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr. c/o Bayer AG, K-RP LTK, Q 18 D-51368 Leverkusen, Bayerwerk / DE | ||
Former [1982/24] | Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Zentralbereich Patente Marken und Lizenzen D-5090 Leverkusen 1, Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 81109731.0 | 17.11.1981 | [1982/24] | Priority number, date | DE19803044696 | 27.11.1980 Original published format: DE 3044696 | [1982/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0053741 | Date: | 16.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0053741 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08B11/20, C08B31/08 | [1982/24] | CPC: |
C08B11/20 (EP,US);
C08B31/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1982/24] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Cellulose- und Stärkeethern | [1982/24] | English: | Purification of cellulose and starch ethers | [1982/24] | French: | Purification d'éthers de la cellulose et de l'amidon | [1982/24] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 28.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1985
13.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Gottschal, Auko Jan R. Sieders c.s. Postbus 314 NL-6800 AH Arnhem / NL | 02
14.06.1985
08.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | 03
15.06.1985
08.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1985
13.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Gottschal, Auko Jan R. Sieders c.s. Postbus 314 NL-6800 AH Arnhem / NL | ||
02
14.06.1985
08.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
03
15.06.1985
08.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1985/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1985
13.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Gottschal, Auko Jan R. Sieders c.s. Postbus 314 NL-6800 AH Arnhem / NL | 30.07.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.04.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.08.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1298961 [ ] (KIRKLEES LTD); | DE2038310 [ ] (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) | [ ] - KIRK-OTHMER: "Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology", 3. Auflage, Teil 10: "Filtration", 1980, John Wiley & Sons, seiten 284-337 New York, U.S.A. * seite 320, abbildung 18 * |