EP0081003 - Sail arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.1986 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquata Surfboard Division GmbH & Co Freiheit 11 D-13597 Berlin / DE | [1986/32] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states GST Gesellschaft für Surftechnologie und Production mbH Helmholtzstrasse 2-9 D-1000 Berlin 10 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hose, Lorenz Bismarkstrasse 64 D-1 Berlin 20 / DE | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Göbel, Matthias Pruppacher Hauptstrasse 5-7 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Göbel, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Pruppacher Hauptstrasse 5-7 D-90602 Pyrbaum / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110211.0 | 07.12.1981 | [1983/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081003 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081003 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/82, B63H9/08 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B63H8/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/24] | B63B35/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | Segelvorrichtung | [1983/24] | English: | Sail arrangement | [1983/24] | French: | Arrangement de voile | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.1987
09.06.1988
INADMISSIBLE Jung, Otto, Dr. med. Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 14 D-50672 Köln / DE | [1988/44] |
Former [1987/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.1987
INADMISSIBLE Jung, Otto, Dr. med. Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 14 D-50672 Köln / DE | 06.02.1987 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 14.02.1987 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 23.02.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.06.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.07.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.04.1986 | FR | 16.04.1986 | IT | 16.04.1986 | NL | 16.04.1986 | SE | 30.04.1986 | AT | 07.12.1986 | CH | 31.12.1986 | LI | 31.12.1986 | LU | 31.12.1986 | GB | 22.11.1988 | DE | 01.09.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/03] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
IT | 16.04.1986 | ||
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.12.1986 | ||
LI | 31.12.1986 | ||
LU | 31.12.1986 | ||
GB | 22.11.1988 | ||
DE | 01.09.1990 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
IT | 16.04.1986 | ||
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.12.1986 | ||
LI | 31.12.1986 | ||
LU | 31.12.1986 | ||
DE | 01.09.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
IT | 16.04.1986 | ||
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.12.1986 | ||
LI | 31.12.1986 | ||
DE | 01.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/25] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.12.1986 | ||
LI | 31.12.1986 | ||
DE | 01.09.1990 | ||
Former [1989/23] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.12.1986 | ||
LI | 31.12.1986 | ||
Former [1989/15] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
Former [1989/13] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
AT | 07.12.1986 | ||
Former [1988/26] | BE | 16.04.1986 | |
NL | 16.04.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 16.04.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3003529 (PLAN UND FORM S A [CH]) | Examination | WO8203053 |