EP0054251 - Spacer for insulating a multiple-glass sheet structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/25] | Spacing section for insulating a multiple-glass sheet structure | ||
[1985/06] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.05.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Xaver Bayer Isolierglasfabrik KG Postfach 1161 79212 Elzach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states Franz Xaver Bayer Isolierglasfabrik KG Postfach 1161 D-79212 Elzach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bayer, Franz Schwimmbadstrasse 2 D-7807 Elzach / DE | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Hans Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110269.8 | 09.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | DE19803047338 | 16.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3047338 | [1982/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054251 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054251 | Date: | 06.02.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/66 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
E06B3/66352 (EP);
E06B3/66314 (EP);
E06B3/66342 (EP);
E06B3/667 (EP);
E06B3/66304 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/25] | Title | German: | Abstandhalter für Mehrscheiben-Isolierglas | [1985/06] | English: | Spacer for insulating a multiple-glass sheet structure | [1985/06] | French: | Profil d'écartement pour vitrage multiple isolant | [1982/25] |
Former [1982/25] | Abstandhalter-Profil für Mehrscheiben-Isolierglas | ||
Former [1982/25] | Spacing section for insulating a multiple-glass sheet structure | Examination procedure | 12.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/29] | 27.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.1985
03.12.1985
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1986/02] | 12.12.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.12.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/27] | Appeal following opposition | 21.03.1987 | Appeal received No. T0129/87 | 18.05.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.09.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1988/37] | 02.12.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.02.1985 | LU | 31.12.1985 | AT | 09.12.1988 | GB | 09.12.1988 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | SE | 06.02.1985 | |
LU | 31.12.1985 | ||
AT | 09.12.1988 | ||
GB | 09.12.1988 | ||
Former [1990/10] | SE | 06.02.1985 | |
AT | 09.12.1988 | ||
GB | 09.12.1988 | ||
Former [1990/09] | SE | 06.02.1985 | |
AT | 09.12.1988 | ||
GB | 09.12.1988 | ||
Former [1990/05] | SE | 06.02.1985 | |
GB | 09.12.1988 | ||
Former [1989/48] | SE | 06.02.1985 | |
GB | 09.12.1988 | ||
Former [1989/23] | SE | 06.02.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE7224630U [ ]; | DE1093056 [ ] (ISODO GES MIT BESCHRAENKTER HA); | GB858881 [ ] (FRANZ XAVER BAYER); | US3001249 [ ] (ELTON WILLIAM L, et al); | DE7214853U [ ]; | FR2412238 [ ] (FRANK GMBH WILH [DE]); | DE7925919U [ ]; | DE2824396 [ ] (BAYER FRANZ) | Examination | DE2829444 |