EP0054846 - Diamond and cubic boron nitride abrasive compacts using size selective abrasive particle layers and process for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1986 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bovenkerk, Harold Paul 622 Seabury Drive Worthington Ohio 43085 / US | 02 /
Kibler, Gordon Markwood 10 Thormanby Lawns Howth County Dublin / IE | [1982/26] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [1985/17] | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1982/26] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 81110302.7 | 10.12.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | US19800219289 | 22.12.1980 Original published format: US 219289 | [1982/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054846 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054846 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/06, B24D3/08, C22C29/00, C04B35/58, B21C3/02 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
C22B26/00 (EP,US);
B01J3/062 (EP,US);
B22F7/06 (EP,US);
B24D3/06 (EP,US);
C22C26/00 (EP,US);
B01J2203/062 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0645 (EP,US);
B01J2203/0655 (EP,US);
B01J2203/066 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F2207/13 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/052, C22C26/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Verschleissfeste Agglomerate aus Diamant und kubischem Bornitrid unter Verwendung von Schichten aus verschleissfesten Teilchen ausgewählter Korngrösse und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1982/26] | English: | Diamond and cubic boron nitride abrasive compacts using size selective abrasive particle layers and process for making same | [1982/26] | French: | Agglomérés abrasifs de diamant et de nitrure de bore cubique en utilisant des couches de particules abrasives de granulométrie choisie et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1982/26] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/05] | 16.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3831428 [ ] (WENTORF R, et al); | GB2029389 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | GB2048956 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) |