EP0054286 - Method of manufacturing a cast iron part with a loose flange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Posi-Seal International GmbH Industriestrasse 13 D-4422 Ahaus / DE | [1982/32] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states Atomac Dieter Brütsch KG Konkursverwalter Hinkers, Josef Bahnhofstrasse 44-46 D-4422 Ahaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buss, Werner Tückingstrasse 24 D-4422 Ahaus / DE | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/31] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110405.8 | 14.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | DE19803046826 | 12.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3046826 | [1982/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054286 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/00, B22D25/00, B29F1/00 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
B29C45/006 (EP);
B22D25/00 (EP);
F16L23/0283 (EP);
B29C2045/0065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, LI, NL [1982/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gussformteiles mit Losflansch | [1982/25] | English: | Method of manufacturing a cast iron part with a loose flange | [1982/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément en fonte ayant une bride rapportée | [1982/25] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/15] | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1002578 [ ]; | FR1486842 [ ]; | FR2162266 [ ]; | FR2107514 [ ] |