EP0054301 - Lighting circuit for a low-pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.1986 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 D-81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fähnrich, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Hofheimerstrasse 11 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1982/25] | Application number, filing date | 81110450.4 | 15.12.1981 | [1982/25] | Priority number, date | DE19803047289 | 16.12.1980 Original published format: DE 3047289 | [1982/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054301 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054301 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/04 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
H05B41/046 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/25] | Title | German: | Zündvorrichtung für eine Niederdruckentladungslampe | [1982/25] | English: | Lighting circuit for a low-pressure discharge lamp | [1982/25] | French: | Dispositif d'allumage pour lampe à décharge à basse pression | [1986/08] |
Former [1982/25] | Dispositif d'allumage pour lampe à décharge á basse pression | Examination procedure | 08.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 09.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2034855 [ ] (LUEHRS O); | GB2024545 [ ] (PHILIPS NV) | Examination | DE1952697 |