EP0056466 - Pyrazoline derivatives, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical formulations containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Copp, Frederick Charles "Rotherwood" 32 Stanley Avenue Beckenham Kent / GB | 02 /
Caldwell, Albert Gordon 119 Gates Green Road West Wickham Kent / GB | 03 /
Collard, David 25 The Mead Beckenham Kent / GB | [1982/30] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 D-81629 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/30] | Berg, Wilhelm, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110456.1 | 15.12.1981 | [1982/30] | Priority number, date | GB19800041149 | 23.12.1980 Original published format: GB 8041149 | GB19810008478 | 18.03.1981 Original published format: GB 8108478 | [1982/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0056466 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0056466 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/06, C07D401/04, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61K31/47, // (C07D401/04, 231:06, 213:76),(C07D401/04, 231:06, 215:38, 401:12) | [1982/30] | CPC: |
C07D231/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/30] | Title | German: | Pyrazolin-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1982/30] | English: | Pyrazoline derivatives, processes for their preparation and pharmaceutical formulations containing them | [1982/30] | French: | Dérivés de la pyrazoline, leurs procédés de préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1982/30] | File destroyed: | 14.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/46] | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0022578 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [APD]GB679678 (ILFORD LTD) |