EP0068048 - Enriched plasma derivative for promoting wound sealing and wound covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.05.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serapharm GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 36 D-48145 Münster / DE | [1985/18] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states Serapharm - Michael Stroetmann Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 36 D-4400 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroetmann, Michael Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 36 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Brehm, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Brehm, Hans-Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81110616.0 | 18.12.1981 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | DE19813124962 | 25.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3124962 | [1983/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068048 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068048 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068048 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/04, A61L15/03, A61K37/54, A61K37/475, A61K37/02, A61K35/16 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
A61L27/225 (EP,US);
A61K35/16 (EP,US);
A61K35/19 (EP,US);
A61K38/363 (EP,US);
A61K38/37 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (EP,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/4833 (EP,US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61L24/102 (EP,US);
A61L24/106 (EP,US);
A61L24/108 (EP,US);
A61L26/0033 (EP,US);
A61L26/0042 (EP,US);
A61L26/0057 (EP,US);
A61L26/0066 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00377 (EP,US);
A61L2300/252 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2300/418 (EP,US);
A61L2300/432 (EP,US);
A61L2300/434 (EP,US);
A61L2400/04 (EP,US);
Y10S530/83 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/16, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/19, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/363, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/37, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/38, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Angereichertes Plasmaderivat zur Unterstützung von Wundverschluss und Wundabdeckung | [1983/01] | English: | Enriched plasma derivative for promoting wound sealing and wound covering | [1983/01] | French: | Dérivé enrichi du plasma pour favoriser la fermeture et le revêtement de plaies | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 10.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1986
04.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE Hormon-Chemie München GmbH Freisinger Landstrasse 74 D-80939 München / DE Opponent's representative Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.1986
04.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE Hormon-Chemie München GmbH Freisinger Landstrasse 74 D-80939 München / DE Opponent's representative Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | 21.05.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.01.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.02.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.12.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.01.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.02.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2448900 (IMMUNO AG [AT]) | [A] - ARCHIV FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHE UND UNFALL-CHIRURGIE, Band 90, Nr. 1, 1977, Seiten 63-65, Bergman-Verlag, Wiesbaden, DE. |